U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00074-2
  • Case Name: USA v. James et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • February 11, 2022: [Remark]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2018: [Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 29, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 20, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 30, 2016: [Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order]
  • July 21, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.