U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dukes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • March 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 22, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 17, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 29, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.