U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00009-4
  • Case Name: USA v. McGee et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Remark]
  • June 10, 2022: [Remark]
  • June 10, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Remark]
  • July 23, 2020: [Remark]
  • July 23, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 23, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • August 21, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 21, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • January 22, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 11, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 08, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • December 05, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 05, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 05, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 04, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 04, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [CJA Appointment Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 27, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 10, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 12, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Reply to Response]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • February 21, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 20, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 03, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2016: [Compel]
  • November 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2016: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 30, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.