U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 05, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 31, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Bond]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 07, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 06, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • July 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.