U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guzman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 17, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 01, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • June 30, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.