U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Imel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 09, 2017: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 27, 2016: [Waiver]
  • July 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.