U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00028-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 01, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • December 14, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [USCA Order]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Reply to Response]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 22, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 18, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 14, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 03, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Reply to Response]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 13, 2018: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 31, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Response]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 19, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 19, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • August 19, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 18, 2016: [Forfeiture Hearing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 25, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Letter]
  • July 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2016: [Service by Publication]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 11, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order]
  • July 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2016: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 05, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.