U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 09, 2023: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Recusal]
  • May 31, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Remark]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 03, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2019: [Information - Felony]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2017: [Response]
  • June 12, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 01, 2017: [Change of Address]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 11, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 09, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • August 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.