U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shiers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 09, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • December 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.