U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Serrano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 13, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • July 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.