U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woodward
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • August 22, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2016: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.