U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bennett et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Unclaimed Exhibits Destroyed]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Disposal of Trial Exhibits]
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • October 16, 2017: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • June 01, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 22, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 22, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 15, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • April 06, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 05, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Government]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 14, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 01, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 01, 2017: [Seal]
  • February 01, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • January 30, 2017: [Seal]
  • January 26, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Government]
  • January 25, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 25, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 24, 2017: [Remark]
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 19, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • January 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment NOV]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 14, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 13, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • November 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • November 08, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 08, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 08, 2016: [Joinder]
  • November 07, 2016: [Release from Custody]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 27, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 25, 2016: [Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • October 11, 2016: [Joinder]
  • October 10, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 02, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Joinder]
  • September 30, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 29, 2016: [Judgment NOV]
  • September 29, 2016: [New Trial]
  • September 29, 2016: [Joinder]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 12, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 18, 2016: [Joinder]
  • August 17, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • August 10, 2016: [Joinder]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • July 29, 2016: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 29, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Declaration of Mistrial]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 25, 2016: [Quash]
  • July 25, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 25, 2016: [Subpoena Returned]
  • July 24, 2016: [Declaration of Mistrial]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 19, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • July 18, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2016: [Objection to Subpoena]
  • July 15, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 14, 2016: [Take Deposition]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order]
  • July 05, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.