U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Remark]
  • September 26, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 25, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 09, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • November 09, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [Unseal Case]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2016: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.