U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00075-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Thornton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 24, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
  • August 13, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 07, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 23, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • July 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 10, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 09, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • July 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 05, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.