U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stewart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 29, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order]
  • September 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 06, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.