U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 09, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.