U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 03, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • November 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sentencing]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.