U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McFall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.