U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Necaise et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 18, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 02, 2018: [Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 15, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sealed Document]
January, 2018
  • January 28, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 25, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 31, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 15, 2017: [Trial Order]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 30, 2017: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 27, 2017: [Unseal Document]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2017: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 23, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 14, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.