U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 21, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Brady Materials]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2016: [Waiver]
  • August 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 10, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 11, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.