U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acosta et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 04, 2021: [Reply to Response]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.