U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rayborn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 07, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Government]
  • June 07, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 04, 2017: [Bond]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 04, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.