U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blevins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Remark]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • May 19, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • May 11, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Hearing]
  • February 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 10, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • February 07, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Release from Custody]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Response to Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Memorandum Opinion]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.