U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 01, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 15, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 07, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 06, 2022: [Bond]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 29, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 15, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 03, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 02, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • November 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 20, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 28, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 20, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • August 17, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 09, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 24, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • June 15, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 11, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 11, 2020: [Rebuttal]
  • June 10, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 27, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 20, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Mail Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • March 22, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • March 22, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 02, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • November 26, 2018: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 08, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 12, 2018: [Remark]
  • October 02, 2018: [Remark]
  • October 02, 2018: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Change of Address]
  • July 09, 2018: [Reconsideration]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2016: [Reconsideration]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • September 19, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 16, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • July 22, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 22, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.