U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eaton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2018: [Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Rule 20 - Return In]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Remark]
  • February 15, 2017: [Letter]
  • February 15, 2017: [Rule 20 - Transfer Out]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 11, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 30, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 23, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 22, 2016: [Disclosure]
  • September 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 10, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2016: [Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 26, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • July 19, 2016: [Waiver]
  • July 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 08, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.