U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Casper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Mail Returned]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.