U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benitez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 09, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 21, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2016: [Disclosure]
  • October 12, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 12, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 12, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 05, 2016: [Suppress]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 01, 2016: [Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.