U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 08, 2021: [Remark]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • December 14, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Remark]
  • October 19, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • October 06, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • September 01, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • July 17, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 15, 2020: [Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 09, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 07, 2020: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • July 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 01, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 22, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Reply to Response]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 14, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 12, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 30, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 15, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • January 09, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Transcript Request]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • December 28, 2017: [Disclosure]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 31, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • July 12, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.