U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:02-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2016
  • July 23, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 12, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • July 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.