U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jim et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • February 01, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 25, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 19, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.