U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jack
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 29, 2022: [Remark]
  • September 29, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2017: [Psychiatric Report]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 21, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 18, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.