U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grear et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Claim for Exemptions]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 13, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • April 13, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 02, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 09, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 02, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.