U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wotring
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Remark]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 29, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • August 02, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 01, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 01, 2016: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 12, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • July 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.