U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-00146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harper et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 15, 2017: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 02, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 02, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • January 05, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 03, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 15, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 15, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 01, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2016: [Arrest]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 18, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 12, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 12, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.