U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Case Inquiry Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.