U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2019: [Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 10, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 21, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 27, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Disclosure]
  • January 03, 2018: [Brady Materials]
  • January 03, 2018: [Discovery]
  • January 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 22, 2017: [Case Reopened]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2017: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2017: [Docket Call]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 26, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • September 26, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Letter]
  • July 28, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2017: [Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 13, 2017: [Letter]
  • June 02, 2017: [Letter]
  • June 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 19, 2017: [Expedite]
  • May 11, 2017: [Hearing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Letter]
  • April 14, 2017: [Reply to Response]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Response in Support]
  • March 16, 2017: [Vacate]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 10, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 08, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 08, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 06, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • March 01, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2017: [Attachment]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 01, 2016: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Expedite]
  • October 13, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 13, 2016: [Vacate]
  • October 04, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 05, 2016: [Vacate]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2016: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2016: [Attachment]
  • July 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.