U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dickson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Government]
  • September 13, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 24, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.