U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 05, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice fee paid(credit card)]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 27, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 26, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • May 06, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • May 06, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Attachment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • November 21, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Inspect]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • March 01, 2019: [Remark]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 10, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 08, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 08, 2019: [Inspect]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • January 02, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • November 06, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Affidavit]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • July 03, 2018: [Letter]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • February 07, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 10, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • February 10, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • February 02, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • February 02, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 01, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 31, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • January 27, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • January 20, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • January 20, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 20, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 12, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 09, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 06, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 04, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 04, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.