U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Status Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 11, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • June 29, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 31, 2022: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2022: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • January 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 15, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 29, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 29, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 14, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • July 14, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.