U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:11-cr-00010-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Remark]
  • June 03, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Unclaimed Exhibits Destroyed]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of Disposal of Trial Exhibits]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • July 14, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.