U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00018-2
  • Case Name: USA v. McGruder et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Change of Address]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Sealed Document]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 22, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order]
  • July 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.