U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maurice et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.