U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cr-00049-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Serrano et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 20, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 15, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.