U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Waiver]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 22, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2020: [Remark]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 10, 2020: [Unseal Case]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.