U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • September 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 07, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 16, 2017: [Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 08, 2017: [Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2016: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • December 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Unseal Document]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 14, 2016: [Seal]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 09, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 28, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 28, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2016: [Bond]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2016: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • July 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.