U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stamps
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 10, 2017: [Letter]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 20, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 18, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • July 18, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 18, 2016: [Letter]
  • July 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.