U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order]
  • July 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 23, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.