U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jim
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Consent By Videoconference]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 21, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • July 19, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.