U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Booth et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.