U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00086-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Santana et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • May 16, 2022: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • October 28, 2021: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 13, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 10, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
  • October 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 18, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 16, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 08, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 08, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 22, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2016: [Status Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.